EP0391043 - Centrifuge for continuously separating materials of different densities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.12.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 51149 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schilp, Reinhold, Dr. Maistrasse 8 D-8031 Wörthsee / DE | 02 /
Epper, Wolfgang Eichelhäherweg 3 D-5010 Bergheim / DE | [1990/41] | Application number, filing date | 90102760.7 | 13.02.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | DE19893911320 | 07.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3911320 | [1990/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0391043 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0391043 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/20 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
B04B1/20 (EP,US);
B04B2001/2083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GB, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | Zentrifuge zum kontinuierlichen Trennen von Stoffen unterschiedlicher Dichte | [1990/41] | English: | Centrifuge for continuously separating materials of different densities | [1990/41] | French: | Centrifugeuse pour la séparation continue de matières de densités différentes | [1990/41] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 10.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 09.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/04] | 08.09.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57194061 ; | [X]JP56152754 ; | [X]FR2008778 (GARBATY RUDOLF) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 43 (C-152)(1188) 19 Februar 1983, & JP-A-57 194061 (KOBE SEIKOSHO K.K.) 29 November 1982,, & JP57194061 A 19821129 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 35 (C-93)(913) 03 März 1982, & JP-A-56 152754 (KOBE SEIKOSHO K.K.) 26 November 1981,, & JP56152754 A 19811126 |