EP0387532 - Gas turbine combustion chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 CH-5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Jakob, Dr. Plattenstrasse 8 CH-5605 Dottikon / CH | 02 /
Sattelmayer, Thomas, Dr. Hauptstrasse 108 CH-5318 Mandach / CH | [1990/38] | Application number, filing date | 90102789.6 | 13.02.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | CH19890000945 | 15.03.1989 Original published format: CH 94589 | [1990/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0387532 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387532 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/46, F23R3/30, F23R3/34, F23R3/26 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
F23R3/30 (EP,US);
F23C7/002 (EP,US);
F23D11/402 (EP,US);
F23R3/12 (EP,US);
F23R3/34 (EP,US);
F23R3/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/38] | Title | German: | Brennkammer einer Gasturbine | [1990/38] | English: | Gas turbine combustion chamber | [1990/38] | French: | Chambre de combustion d'une turbine à gaz | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.11.1994 | NL | 30.11.1994 | AT | 13.02.1995 | CH | 28.02.1995 | LI | 28.02.1995 | SE | 28.02.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.11.1994 | |
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
AT | 13.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1996/28] | NL | 30.11.1994 | |
AT | 13.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | NL | 30.11.1994 | |
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | NL | 30.11.1994 | |
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 30.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE572173 ; | [X]FR944310 (BENDIX AVIAT CORP); | [X]FR1130091 (NAT RES DEV); | [X]GB914906 (SNECMA); | [A]US4058977 (MARKOWSKI STANLEY J, et al); | [AD]EP0210462 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) |