EP0384304 - Method for removing roots from cormous plant bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/35] | Method for removing roots from cormatose plant bodies | ||
[1995/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WASEDA UNIVERSITY 6-1, Nishi-Waseda 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | For all designated states WASEDA UNIVERSITY 6-1, Nishi-Waseda 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miwa, Yoshiyuki 333-13, Nakamachi Kodaira-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kodama, Hiroshi 12-32, Yochoumachi Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Murase, Takuya c/o Ishizaki, 1-27-3-1207, Nishigahara Kita-ku / JP | 04 /
Shikae, Sadao, c/o Okinoerabu Biotech.Inst.Co.Ltd. 423-32, Taniyama, Wadomari-cho Ooshima-gun, Kagoshima-ken / JP | 05 /
Nakagawa, Masaya, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Kabumoto, Tsutomu, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Schieferdecker, Lutz Herrnstrasse 37 63065 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Schieferdecker, Lutz, Dipl.-Ing. Herrnstrasse 37 D-63065 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102992.6 | 16.02.1990 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | JP19890040382 | 22.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4038289 | JP19890196935 | 31.07.1989 Original published format: JP 19693589 | [1990/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0384304 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0384304 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A23N15/08, A23N15/02 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
A23N15/08 (EP,US);
A23N15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1990/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entfernen von Zwiebelgewächswurzeln | [1990/35] | English: | Method for removing roots from cormous plant bodies | [1995/02] | French: | Méthode pour éliminer les racines des plantes bulbeuses | [1990/35] |
Former [1990/35] | Method for removing roots from cormatose plant bodies | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE397923 (P NAVARRE & FILS SOC); | [A]US3942428 (CLAUSEN CLAUS); | [Y]DE3605639 (CAMPESATO MARINO & FIGLI SNC [IT]) |