EP0384320 - Antihyperlipidemic and anti-atherosclerotic trisubstituted urea compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1993 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trivedi, Bharat Kalidas 44833 Tillotson Drive Canton, Michigan 48187 / US | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Mansmann, Ivo Gödecke AG Patentwesen Mooswaldallee 1-9 79090 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Mansmann, Ivo Gödecke AG Patentwesen Mooswaldallee 1-9 D-79090 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103040.3 | 16.02.1990 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | US19890312857 | 17.02.1989 Original published format: US 312857 | [1990/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0384320 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C275/28, C07C275/30, A61K31/17 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
C07C275/30 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C275/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/35] | Title | German: | Trisubstituierte Harnstoffverbindungen mit antihyperlipidemischer und antiatherosklerotischer Wirkung | [1990/35] | English: | Antihyperlipidemic and anti-atherosclerotic trisubstituted urea compounds | [1990/35] | French: | Composés d'urée trisubstitués, antihyperlipidémiques et antiathérosclérotiques | [1990/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 18.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/09] | 18.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4623662 (DE VRIES VERN G [US]); | [AD]US4397868 (DEVRIES VERN G) | [XP] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 32, no. 10, October 1989, pages 2318-2325, American Chemical Society, Washington, US; V.G. DE VRIES et al.: "Potential antiatherosclerotic agents. 6.1 Hypocholesterolemic trisubstituted urea analogues" |