EP0392163 - System for geological defect detection utilizing composite video-infrared thermography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENTECH ENGINEERING, INC. 111 Marine Lane St.Louis Missouri 63146 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | For all designated states ENTECH ENGINEERING, INC. 111 Marine Lane St.Louis, Missouri 63146 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weil, Gary L. 111 Marine Lane St. Louis, Missouri 63146 / US | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/42] | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia, Dr. Rauchstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103164.1 | 19.02.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | US19890339070 | 14.04.1989 Original published format: US 339070 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392163 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392163 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392163 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/72, G01N9/00, G01C11/00 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
G01V9/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/42] | G01N25/72, G01N9/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ermitteln von geologischen Fehlern mittels gleichzeitigen Videoabtastens und Infrarotthermographie | [1990/42] | English: | System for geological defect detection utilizing composite video-infrared thermography | [1990/42] | French: | Système de détection des défauts géologiques par moyen de balayage vidéo et de thermographie infrarouge simultanés | [1990/42] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 09.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1993 | 01.03.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.02.1995 | [1996/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1605188 (EMI LTD); | [X]DE3726065 (FREDRICH FRIEDHELM [DE]); | [A]US4751571 (LILLQUIST ROBERT D [US]); | [A]US3761713 (MERRILL R); | [A]US4700223 (SHOUTARO KATO [JP], et al) | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOCIETY OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS vol. 934, April 1988, Redondo Beach, CA, USA pages 155 - 163; G.J. WEIL: "Remote Infrared Thermal Sensing of Sewer Voids,Four-Year Update" |