EP0386525 - Glassionomer element for bone prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERA Patent GmbH & Co. KG Gesellschaft für industrielle Schutzrechte Am Griesberg 2 82229 Seefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states THERA Patent GmbH & Co. KG Gesellschaft für industrielle Schutzrechte Am Griesberg 2 D-82229 Seefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helms, Jan, Prof. Dr. Josef-Schneider-Strasse 11 8700 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
Geyer, Götz, Dr. Joseph-Schneider-Strasse 11 8700 Würzburg / DE | 03 /
Wanek, Erich, Dr. An der Breite 9 D-8031 Seefeld / DE | 04 /
Zöllner, Werner, Dr. Am Siehstnichtgern 3 D-8031 Oberpfaffenhofen / DE | 05 /
Gasser, Oswald, Dr. Höhenstrasse 10 D-8031 Seefeld / DE | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103342.3 | 21.02.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | DE19893907663 | 09.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3907663 | [1990/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0386525 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0386525 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386525 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
C03C4/0007 (EP,US);
A61F2/18 (EP,US);
A61F2/28 (EP,US);
A61L27/446 (EP,US);
A61L27/46 (EP,US);
A61F2/186 (EP,US);
A61F2/2803 (EP,US);
A61F2/3094 (EP,US);
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/446, A61F2/28, C08L33/02 (EP,US);
A61L27/446, C08L33/02 (US,EP);
A61L27/46, A61F2/28, C08L33/02 (US,EP);
A61L27/46, C08L33/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/44] |
Former [1990/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Knochenersatzteil aus Glasionomerzement | [1990/37] | English: | Glassionomer element for bone prosthesis | [1990/37] | French: | Elément de prothèse osseuse en verre ionomère | [1990/37] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, GR, LU, NL | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 04.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.04.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.1990 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.1990 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3814717 (WILSON A, et al); | [A]US4250277 (MARIES ALAN [GB], et al) | Examination | DE2319715 |