EP0387556 - Infra-red detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Gerätetechnik GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Gerätetechnik GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 Postfach 1120 D-88662 Überlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bross, Walter Konstantin-Vanotti-Strasse 3 D-7770 Überlingen / DE | 02 /
Rid, Robert Drosselweg 9 D-7778 Markdorf / DE | 03 /
Kordulla, Hans Prielstrasse 43 D-7776 Owingen / DE | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Weisse, Jürgen, et al Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtraustrasse 38 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | Weisse, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, et al Fuggerstrasse 26 D-10777 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103387.8 | 22.02.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | DE19893908627 | 16.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3908627 | [1990/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0387556 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0387556 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387556 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/00, H05K9/00 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
G01V8/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/38] | H05K9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/38] | Title | German: | Infrarotdetektor | [1990/38] | English: | Infra-red detector | [1990/38] | French: | Détecteur infra-rouge | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 24.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1012467 ; | [Y]DD134182 (KUSCHEL GEORG, et al); | [YD]DE2109561 ; | [AD]EP0125016 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [AD]EP0198549 (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR [FR], et al) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED Woche 8408, 4. April 1984, Zusammenfassung Nr. 047737 S/01, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & SU - A - 1012467 (PIVOVAROV VV) 15.04.1983, & SU1012467 A 00000000 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ELECTRONICS CONFERENCEBand 37, 1983, Seiten 132-136, Oak Brook, IL, US; K.E. FELSKE: "Designing metallic enclosures for EMI shielding" |