EP0387585 - Flat cable spirals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. L. Gore & Associates GmbH Postfach 1147 85636 Putzbrunn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates GmbH Postfach 1147 D-85636 Putzbrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rescher, Wolf Virchowstrasse 91 D-8542 Roth / DE | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103727.5 | 26.02.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | DE19893906308 | 28.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3906308 | [1990/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0387585 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387585 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02G11/00, H01B7/06, H01R35/02 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
B60R16/027 (EP);
H01B7/06 (EP);
H01R35/025 (EP);
H02G11/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/38] | H02G11/00, H01R35/02, H01B7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/46] |
Former [1990/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Flacchkabelspirale | [1990/38] | English: | Flat cable spirals | [1990/38] | French: | Spirale de câble plat | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, LU, NL | 27.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.04.1990 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.1990 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.1990 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.1990 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.1990 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 23.02.1994 | IT | 23.02.1994 | SE | 23.02.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | ES | 23.02.1994 | |
IT | 23.02.1994 | ||
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 23.02.1994 | |
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 23.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59149276 ; | [A]DE2742900 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]EP0217336 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 280 (M-347)(1717) 21 Dezember 1984, & JP-A-59 149276 (HITACHI DENSEN) 27 August 1984,, & JP59149276 A 19840827 |