EP0386621 - Watch comprising a middle plate carried by two side members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Granges / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Triponez, André La Communance, 94 CH-2516 Lamboing / CH | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 90103967.7 | 01.03.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | CH19890000830 | 07.03.1989 Original published format: CH 83089 | [1990/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0386621 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386621 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G04B29/02, G04B37/18, G04B37/16, G04B37/22 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
G04B29/027 (EP,US);
G04B37/0058 (EP,US);
G04B37/1486 (EP,US);
G04B37/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/37] | Title | German: | Uhr mit einer durch zwei Längsträger getragenen Werkplatten- und Mittelteil-Einheit | [1990/37] | English: | Watch comprising a middle plate carried by two side members | [1990/37] | French: | Montre comportant une platine carrure portée par deux longerons | [1990/37] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 08.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH652885 ; | [A]US1786762 (LYONS DANIEL P); | [A]FR784133 (ENCAUSSE & KRASKER); | [A]CH194225 (CROISIER GEORGES [CH]); | [A]DE1919130 (KLINGENBERG HANS ULRICH); | [A]US3726082 (KUSHIDA H); | [A]FR2272433 (MEYER FERDINAND [CH]); | [YD]EP0082119 (RADO MONTRES SA [CH]); | [YD]EP0216223 (EBAUCHESFABRIK ETA AG [CH]) |