EP0396866 - Patient support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/46] | Lithotripter patient support | ||
[1996/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORNIER MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH Postfach 11 28, Industriestrasse 15 82101 Germering / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states DORNIER MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH Postfach 11 28, Industriestrasse 15 D-82101 Germering / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiler, Herbert Kapellenstrasse 55 D-8031 Alling / DE | 02 /
Buchbauer, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Rathausstrasse 4 D-8046 Garching / DE | 03 /
Hofsäss, Siegfried, Dr. Adalbert-Stifter Strasse 18 D-8034 Germering / DE | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Landsmann, Ralf Dornier GmbH LHG 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | Landsmann, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Dornier GmbH FNS 003 D-88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104211.9 | 05.03.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | DE19893915381 | 11.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3915381 | [1990/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0396866 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0396866 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396866 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/04, A61B17/22 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
A61B17/2255 (EP,US);
A61B6/0442 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/32] | A61B6/04, A61B17/22, A61G13/00 | ||
Former IPC [1990/46] | A61G13/00, A61B17/22 | Designated contracting states | CH, FR, IT, LI [1996/31] |
Former [1990/46] | CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Patientenliege | [1996/43] | English: | Patient support | [1996/43] | French: | Support de malade | [1996/43] |
Former [1990/46] | Liege für einen Lithotripter | ||
Former [1990/46] | Lithotripter patient support | ||
Former [1990/46] | Support de malade pour un lithotripteur | Examination procedure | 02.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0255645 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]US3751028 (SCHEININGER L, et al) | Examination | - DORNIER LITHOTRIPTER MFL 500, Firmenprospekt |