EP0401472 - Method of producing color spots in repetitive, non-regular patterns on a fabric layer and apparatus for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.1995 [1995/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANFI TRATTAMENTI TESSILI S.P.A. Via Delle Brughiere, 9 I-20024 Garbagnate Milanese (Mi) / IT | [1990/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Savoldelli, Gianmaria Viale Vittorio Emanuele 49 Bergamo / IT | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | La Ciura, Salvatore Via Francesco Sforza 3 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | La Ciura, Salvatore Via Francesco Sforza 3 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90104239.0 | 06.03.1990 | [1990/50] | Priority number, date | IT19890020807 | 07.06.1989 Original published format: IT 2080789 | [1990/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0401472 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D06B11/00 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
D06B11/0059 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen von unregelmässigen Farbtropfen auf laufende Warenbahnen | [1990/50] | English: | Method of producing color spots in repetitive, non-regular patterns on a fabric layer and apparatus for carrying out the method | [1990/50] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la production sur une matière textile en bandes en déplacement de taches de couleurs | [1990/50] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 16.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 09.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/06] | 01.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1077204 (STEVENS & CO INC J P); | [A]US3717722 (MESSNER J); | [X]FR2156702 (NORTH AMERICAN MILLS); | [X]FR2319433 ; | [A]US4578965 (BROSSMAN WILLIAM C [US]); | [A]US4610151 (SANDLER BEN Z [IL]) |