EP0386710 - Vacuum switch apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arita, Hiroshi 6-11, Ayukawacho-3-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Kouzi 721, Arakawa Takahagi-shi / JP | 03 /
Sugawara, Hiroyuki 33-11, Nishinarusawacho-4-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 04 /
Kurosawa, Yukio 9-3, Nakanarusawacho-3-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104286.1 | 06.03.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | JP19890056492 | 10.03.1989 Original published format: JP 5649289 | [1990/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0386710 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386710 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/56 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
H01J17/56 (EP,US);
H01J21/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/37] | Title | German: | Vakuumschalter | [1990/37] | English: | Vacuum switch apparatus | [1990/37] | French: | Interrupteur à vide | [1990/37] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 27.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4668896 (BYRON STANLEY R [US], et al); | [A]US3458758 (FRASER DAVID ALEXANDER, et al); | [A]DE2111121 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]GB2065962 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC VALVE CO LTD) | [A] - INSTRUMENTS & EXPERIMENTAL TECHNIQUES | [A] - ELEKTRONIK | Examination | - INSTRUMENTS & EXPERIMENTAL TECHNIQUES vol. 29, no. 4, part 1, July-August 1986, pages 859-861, New York, US; A.M. EFREMOV et al.: "Coaxial Injection Thyratron" | - ELEKTRONIK, vol. 28, no. 8, 19 April 1979, pages 68-70; H. MENOWN et al.: "Thyratrons für Impulslaser" |