EP0386771 - Electromechanical linear actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.G.B. S.p.A. Corso Lecce, 96 I-10143 Torino / IT | [1990/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brusasco, Enzo Corso Re Umberto, 64 I-10129 Torino / IT | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1990/37] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 90104466.9 | 08.03.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | IT19890067162 | 09.03.1989 Original published format: IT 6716289 | [1990/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0386771 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386771 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/20 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
F16F1/373 (EP,US);
F16H25/20 (EP,US);
H02K7/06 (EP,US);
F16H2025/2081 (EP,US);
F16H25/2204 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18576 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18848 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/37] | Title | German: | Elektromechanischer Linearantrieb | [1990/37] | English: | Electromechanical linear actuator | [1990/37] | French: | Actuateur électromécanique linéaire | [1990/37] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 26.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Request for further processing for: | 25.09.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 26.01.1994 | ES | 26.01.1994 | FR | 26.01.1994 | IT | 26.01.1994 | GB | 26.04.1994 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | DE | 26.01.1994 | |
ES | 26.01.1994 | ||
IT | 26.01.1994 | ||
GB | 26.04.1994 | ||
FR | 17.06.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DE | 26.01.1994 | |
IT | 26.01.1994 | ||
GB | 26.04.1994 | ||
FR | 17.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/19] | DE | 26.01.1994 | |
GB | 26.04.1994 | ||
FR | 17.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/04] | DE | 26.01.1994 | |
FR | 17.06.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | DE | 26.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2649300 (MARK LAUNDER JAMES); | [A]FR1287937 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]GB2078903 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP); | [A]US4583421 (ROSE MARVIN D [US]); | [A]EP0253735 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al); | [A]US4841790 (WILLISTON SCOTT L [US], et al) |