EP0389852 - Mine with equipment for placing a sensor wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft 53839 Troisdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | ||
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöffl, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Bergstrasse 132 D-5068 Odenthal-Erberich / DE | [1990/40] | Application number, filing date | 90104569.0 | 10.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | DE19893909840 | 25.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3909840 | [1990/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389852 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389852 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389852 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F42B23/24, F42C14/08 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
F42B23/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/40] | Title | German: | Mine mit Sensordraht-Verlegeeinheit | [1990/40] | English: | Mine with equipment for placing a sensor wire | [1990/40] | French: | Mine avec dispositif pour poser un fil détecteur | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.05.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.03.1996 | LI | 31.03.1996 | [1997/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3713424 (HONEYWELL REGELSYSTEME GMBH); | [A]DE3338936 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]DE3133275 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) |