EP0389855 - Retarding cloth, fixed to the bottom of a projectile containing submunitions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIEHL GMBH & CO. Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states DIEHL GMBH & CO. Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckel, Alfred Hans-Sachs-Strasse 16 D-8830 Treuchtlingen / DE | 02 /
Thurner, Günter, Dr. Bienengartenstrasse 18 D-8501 Schwaig / DE | [1990/40] | Application number, filing date | 90104631.8 | 12.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | DE19893909902 | 25.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3909902 | [1990/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389855 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389855 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389855 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F42B10/56, F42B12/58 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
F42B10/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/40] | F42B12/58 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/40] | Title | German: | Am Boden eines Submunitionen enthaltenden Trägerprojektils befestigtes Bremstuch | [1990/40] | English: | Retarding cloth, fixed to the bottom of a projectile containing submunitions | [1990/40] | French: | Tissu de freinage, fixé au fond d'un projectile contenant des sous-munitions | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/15] | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 01.06.1994 | IT | 01.06.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 01.06.1994 | |
IT | 01.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/19] | GB | 01.06.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4565341 (ZACHARIN ALEXEY T [US]); | [A]DE3608109 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]); | [YD]DE3608107 (DIEHL GMBH & CO); | [A]DE3643291 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]); | [YP]DE3741779 (AUTOFLUG GMBH [DE]) |