EP0391103 - Process for producing 1,1-dichloro-1-fluoroethane and/or 1-chloro-1,1-difluoroethane free of vinylidene chloride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | ||
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elsheikh, Maher Yousef 784 North Wayne Avenue Wayne, Pennsylviania 19087 / US | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104928.8 | 15.03.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | US19890332690 | 03.04.1989 Original published format: US 332690 | [1990/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0391103 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0391103 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C19/08, C07C17/20 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
C07C17/206 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C19/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1,1-Dichlor-1-fluorethan und/oder 1-Chlor-1,1-difluorethan, frei von Vinyliden-Chlorid | [1990/41] | English: | Process for producing 1,1-dichloro-1-fluoroethane and/or 1-chloro-1,1-difluoroethane free of vinylidene chloride | [1990/41] | French: | Procédé pour la production de 1,1-dichloro-1-fluoroéthane et/ou 1-chloro-1,1-difluoroéthane exempt de chloride vinylidène | [1990/41] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.04.1993 | DE | 21.04.1993 | NL | 21.04.1993 | [1994/03] |
Former [1993/52] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/51] | BE | 21.04.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3833676 (UKAJI R, et al); | [AD]US2894044 (PRILL ERHARD J); | [A]FR2337120 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [A]US2744148 (RUH ROBERT P, et al); | [A]US2744147 (MILKS WARREN N); | [A]US2005708 (WILKENS DAUDT HERBERT, et al) |