EP0381251 - Built-in core body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS KAWAMURA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-15 Higashi Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo-to / JP | [1990/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Hironobu 4-1-7, Komaba Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105000.5 | 28.01.1987 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | JP19860121499 | 07.08.1986 Original published format: JP 12149986 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381251 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381251 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381251 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A41D25/14 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
A41D25/08 (EP,US);
A41D25/14 (EP,KR,US);
A41D25/02 (KR);
A41D25/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/32] | Title | German: | Knotenhülse | [1990/32] | English: | Built-in core body | [1990/32] | French: | Dispositif de mise en forme et de support | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87101180.5 / EP0255849 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1857472 (YANCEY MORRIS JAMES); | [A]US1451355 (WREN HUGH C); | [A]US2727244 (KJARTAN KRISTJANSSON); | [A]US1396240 (BAKERMAN ABRAHAM M); | [A]US3263237 (BELLON ROBERT E) |