EP0396879 - Transmission systems for infusion or transfusion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLINICO INFUSIONSTECHNIK GmbH Postfach 12 41 D-36222 Bad Hersfeld / DE | [1990/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinzerling, Walter C. Holunderweg 14 D-6430 Bad Hersfeld / DE | 02 /
Heinzerling, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Holunderweg 14 D-6430 Bad Hersfeld / DE | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | von Raffay, Vincenz, et al Patentanwälte Raffay & Fleck Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | von Raffay, Vincenz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Raffay, Fleck & Partner Postfach 32 32 17 D-20117 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105047.6 | 17.03.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | DE19893914998 | 08.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3914998 | [1990/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0396879 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0396879 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396879 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61L29/00 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
A61M5/14 (EP);
A61L29/041 (EP);
A61L29/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L29/041, C08L25/04 (EP);
A61L29/041, C08L25/06 (EP);
A61L29/041, C08L53/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, IT [1990/46] | Title | German: | Übertragungssysteme für Infusions- oder Transfusionszwecke | [1990/46] | English: | Transmission systems for infusion or transfusion | [1990/46] | French: | Systèmes de transmission pour les infusions et transfusions | [1990/46] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0007601 (INTERMEDICAT GMBH [CH]); | [Y]DE8810468U |