EP0389908 - Multimode infinitely variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXCELERMATIC INC. 913 Sagebrush Drive Austin Texas 78758 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states EXCELERMATIC INC. 913 Sagebrush Drive Austin Texas 78758 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraus, Charles E. 3927 Knollwood Drive Austin, Texas 78758 / US | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Trappenberg, Hans Trappenberg u. Dimmerling, Postfach 21 13 75 76163 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Trappenberg, Hans Trappenberg u. Dimmerling, Postfach 21 13 75 D-76163 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105123.5 | 19.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | US19890328681 | 27.03.1989 Original published format: US 328681 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389908 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389908 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389908 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16H37/08 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
F16H37/086 (EP,US);
F16H2015/383 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/40] | Title | German: | Stufenloses Getriebe mit verschiedenen Wirkungsweisen | [1990/40] | English: | Multimode infinitely variable transmission | [1990/40] | French: | Variateur de vitesse à plusieurs plages de fonctionnement | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 27.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4693134 (KRAUS CHARLES E [US]); | [A]EP0308078 (DOYLE TRANSMISSIONS LTD [IE]); | [A]US3277745 (HARNED JOHN L, et al); | [A]US2979176 (VOTH JAMES W); | [AD]US4702118 (KRAUS CHARLES E [US]) | Examination | EP0078124 | EP0380933 |