EP0400288 - Bipolar coagulation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richard Wolf GmbH Pforzheimer Strasse 32 75438 Knittlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states Richard Wolf GmbH Pforzheimer Strasse 32 D-75438 Knittlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Melzer, Andreas Zugspitzstrasse 15 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Nahrun, Markus Auf den Rotten 14 D-5253 Lindlar / DE | 03 /
Kipfmüller, Karl, Dr. Mittelgasse 34 D-6204 Taunusstein / DE | 04 /
Reidenbach, H.-D., Prof. Dr. Dahlerhoferstrasse 68 D-5206 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid 1 / DE | 05 /
Buess, Gerd, Prof. Dr. Berliner Strasse 1 D-6501 Nieder-Olm / DE | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Wilcken, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Wilcken, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Musterbahn 1 D-23552 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105285.2 | 21.03.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | DE19893917328 | 27.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3917328 | [1990/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400288 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400288 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400288 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/39 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
A61B18/1442 (EP,US);
A61B18/1402 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3445 (EP,US);
A61B2018/145 (EP,US);
A61M3/0279 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT [1995/43] |
Former [1990/49] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Bipolares Koagulationsinstrument | [1990/49] | English: | Bipolar coagulation apparatus | [1990/49] | French: | Appareil de coagulation bipolaire | [1990/49] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.10.1995 | GB | 25.10.1995 | IT | 25.10.1995 | [1999/42] |
Former [1996/47] | BE | 25.10.1995 | |
GB | 25.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 25.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH547103 (WULLSCHLEGER & SCHWARZ FA); | [A]DE2930982 (REIDENBACH HANS DIETER DIPL IN); | [A]US2011169 (CHARLES WAPPLER FREDERICK); | [A]US2002594 (CHARLES WAPPLER FREDERICK, et al) |