EP0389943 - Field effect transistor limiter circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauer, Donald Jon 8 Twain Drive Allentown, New Jersey 08501 / US | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Robert Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105308.2 | 21.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | US19890329161 | 27.03.1989 Original published format: US 329161 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389943 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389943 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03G11/00 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
H03G11/002 (EP,US);
H03G11/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/40] | Title | German: | Begrenzerschaltung mit Feldeffekttransistoren | [1990/40] | English: | Field effect transistor limiter circuitry | [1990/40] | French: | Circuit limiteur à transistor à effet de champ | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 15.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - no relevant prior art has been found |