EP0388983 - Aimable beam headlamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARELLO S.p.A. Corso Unione Sovietica, 600 I-10135 Torino / IT | [1990/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toso, Roberto Via Raffaello Sanzio, 8/A I-10040 Druento / IT | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Boggio, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 90105587.1 | 23.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | IT19890067211 | 24.03.1989 Original published format: IT 6721189 | [1990/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0388983 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388983 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/04 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0683 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1990/39] | Title | German: | Scheinwerfer mit einstellbarem Lichtstrahlwinkel | [1990/39] | English: | Aimable beam headlamp | [1990/39] | French: | Phare à faisceau ajustable | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 01.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2413239 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]DE8714461U |