EP0390026 - Urazol derivatives as initiators for radical polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgartner, Ehrenfried, Dr. Goethestrasse 1 D-6701 Roedersheim-Gronau / DE | 02 /
Blumenstein, Uwe, Dr. Ganderhofstrasse 2 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Bueschl, Rainer, Dr. Hollandstrasse 14 D-6701 Roedersheim-Gronau / DE | 04 /
Rieber, Norbert, Dr. Liebfrauenstrasse 1c D-6800 Mannheim 51 / DE | [1990/40] | Application number, filing date | 90105694.5 | 26.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | DE19893910022 | 28.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3910022 | [1990/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0390026 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0390026 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/00 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
C08F4/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/40] | Title | German: | Urazolderivate als Starter der radikalischen Polymerisation | [1990/40] | English: | Urazol derivatives as initiators for radical polymerization | [1990/40] | French: | Dérivés d'urazol comme initiateurs de polymérisation radicalaire | [1990/40] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 03.11.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY. vol. 43, no. 5, 1978, EASTON US pages 808 - 815; W.H.PIRKLE: 'PERSISTENT CYCLIC DIACYLHYDRAZYL RADICALS FROM URAZOLES AND PYRAZOLIDINE-3,5-DIONES' |