EP0394682 - Method of ortho-alkylating phenol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Warner, Gregory Lee 731 Central Parkway Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/28] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1990/44] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90105743.0 | 12.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | US19890344641 | 28.04.1989 Original published format: US 344641 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394682 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394682 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/16, C07C39/07, B01J21/10 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
C07C37/16 (EP,US);
A61F13/15 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/16, C07C39/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/44] | Title | German: | Vorgehen zur ortho-Alkylierung von Phenol | [1990/44] | English: | Method of ortho-alkylating phenol | [1990/44] | French: | Procédé pour l'ortho-alkylation de phénol | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU61051B ; | [A]DE1263010 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US4041085 (FRABETTI JR ALTON J); | [A]EP0073471 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0150311 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | JP56063932 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 128 (C-67)(800), 18 August 1981; & JP-A-56 063 932, & JP56063932 A 19810818 |