EP0395888 - Coupling iris [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH Gerberstrasse 33 D-71522 Backnang / DE | [1990/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenberg, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. Albrecht-Bengel-Strasse 1 D-7151 Aspach / DE | 02 /
Wolk, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Auf dem Kies 14 D-7065 Winterbach / DE | [1990/45] | Application number, filing date | 90106107.7 | 30.03.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | DE19893914246 | 29.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3914246 | [1990/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0395888 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0395888 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395888 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/208, H01P1/16 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
H01P1/16 (EP);
H01P1/2082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/45] | Title | German: | Koppelblende | [1990/45] | English: | Coupling iris | [1990/45] | French: | Iris de couplage | [1990/45] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 26.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5499547 ; | [A]US4742317 (THAL JR HERBERT L [US]); | [A]US3715688 (WOODWARD O); | [A]US3230481 (LEWIS DAVID J) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, Band 32, Nr. 11, November 1984, Seiten 1449-1454, New York, US; W.-C. TANG et al.: "A true elliptic-function filter using triple-mode degenerate cavities" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 3, Nr. 121 (E-143), 11. Oktober 1979; & JP-A-54 99 547 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 06-08-1979, & JP5499547 A 00000000 | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, Band 35, Nr. 12, Dezember 1987, Seiten 1143-1149, New York, US; R. BONETTI et al.: "Application of dual TM modes to triple- and quadruple-mode filters" | [XP] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, Band 37, Nr. 12, Dezember 1989, Seiten 2011-2019, New York, US; U. ROSENBERG et al.: "Filter design using in-line triple-mode cavities and novel iris couplings" |