EP0395893 - Device for winding or rewinding a web of paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SULZER-ESCHER WYSS GMBH Postfach 13 80 D-88183 Ravensburg / DE | [1990/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hinz, Joachim Schöneckstrasse 25 D-7992 Tettnang / DE | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Ulrich, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch, Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing., et al Kühhornshofweg 10 D-60320 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106285.1 | 02.04.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | DE19893914547 | 02.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3914547 | [1990/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0395893 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395893 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/30 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
B65H19/30 (EP);
B65H2301/4148 (EP);
B65H2301/4173 (EP);
B65H2301/41734 (EP);
B65H2301/41816 (EP);
B65H2408/236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auf- oder Umrollen einer Papierbahn | [1990/45] | English: | Device for winding or rewinding a web of paper | [1990/45] | French: | Dispositif pour enrouler ou réenrouler une bande de papier | [1990/45] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 10.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1092292 (GEORGE EMERSON LAMB); | [X]US3137456 (HAROLD WEBER, et al); | [X]DE1574426 (REIFENHAEUSER KG); | [Y]DE1574307 ; | [Y]FR2320886 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]); | [X]EP0089595 (KAHLMAN INNOVATION AB [SE]) |