EP0391321 - Ceramic filter for a dust-containing gas and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mimori, Takashi 4-10-141, Midorigaoka 2-chome Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Maeno, Hiroshi 1-19-15-2307 Shibuya Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Endo, Yasuhiko 24-30 Higashihongo 2-chome, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Morishita, Tomohiro 471-126, Ishimori Kanno-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106313.1 | 02.04.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | JP19890086907 | 07.04.1989 Original published format: JP 8690789 | JP19890103537 | 25.04.1989 Original published format: JP 10353789 | JP19890109189 | 01.05.1989 Original published format: JP 10918989 | [1990/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0391321 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0391321 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20, C04B38/06 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
B01D39/2075 (EP,US);
C03C10/0045 (EP,US);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/4582 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/81 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00612 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
Y10S55/05 (EP,US);
Y10S55/09 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/00, C04B35/195, C04B38/0051, C04B38/0074, C04B38/068, C04B41/4582, C04B41/5025 (EP,US);
C04B38/00, C04B35/195, C04B38/0051, C04B38/06 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B38/0051 (EP,US);
C04B41/4582, C04B41/5024, C04B41/52 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/5022, C04B41/52 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1990/41] | C04B38/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | Keramisches Filter für staubhaltige Gase und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1990/41] | English: | Ceramic filter for a dust-containing gas and method for its production | [1990/41] | French: | Filtre céramique pour des gaz chargés de poussières et procédé pour sa production | [1990/41] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/38: Teilanmeldung 94110837.5 eingereicht am 02/04/90 | EPB 1994/38: Divisional application 94110837.5 filed on 02/04/90 | EPB 1994/38: Demande divisionnaire 94110837.5 déposée le 02/04/90 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/18] | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP94110837.5 / EP0630677 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP6331517 ; | [A]JP60106514 ; | [Y]FR2502508 (GECERAL GRPT ETU CERAMIQUES AL [FR]); | [A]FR2580517 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO8701610 (SCHUMACHERSCHE FAB GMBH & CO [DE]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 242 (C-510), 13th July 1988, page 44 C-510; & JP-A-63 31 517 (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD) 10-02-1988, & JP6331517 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 254 (C-308), 11th October 1985, page 5 C-308; & JP-A-60 106 514 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K.) 12-06-1985, & JP60106514 A 00000000 | by applicant | JPS5720269B | JPS58133810 | JPS609843B | JPS6164315 | US4584003 | JPS6331517 | US4753457 |