EP0391394 - Low voltage lighting system with conducting magnetic supports [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LONGLINE Leuchten GmbH Saarbrücker Strasse 1A D-67742 Lauterecken / DE | [1993/43] |
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states LEUCHTENFABRIK HANS JÜRGEN BREITZLER Postfach 12 60, Saarbrückerstrasse 1 A D-67742 Lauterecken / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breitzler, Hans Jürgen Römerweg 1 D-6759 Lohnweiler / DE | [1990/41] | Application number, filing date | 90106453.5 | 04.04.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | DE19893910926 | 05.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3910926 | [1990/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0391394 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0391394 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0391394 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/34 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
F21V21/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | Niederspannungsleuchtensystem mit magnetischen, elektrisch leitenden Halterungen | [1990/41] | English: | Low voltage lighting system with conducting magnetic supports | [1990/41] | French: | Système d'éclairage à basse tension avec supports conducteurs magnétiques | [1990/41] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 24.10.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.06.1990 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | 05.06.1990 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.1992 | 30.04.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.09.1993 | DK | 01.09.1993 | GR | 01.09.1993 | NL | 01.09.1993 | SE | 01.09.1993 | AT | 04.04.1994 | LU | 30.04.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
DK | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
AT | 04.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/40] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
AT | 04.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/26] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | NL | 01.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1400179 (PHILIPS NV); | [AD]DE3446045 (LEUCHTMANN GUENTER); | [A]DE3626521 (GRABAU JAN [DE]); | [YP]DE8904176U ; | [YP]DE8911456U |