EP0392453 - Centrifugal separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAPPLE GMBH & CO., MASCHINENFABRIK i.K. Nikolaus-Thoman-Strasse 5-7 D-89264 Weissenhorn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | For all designated states HAPPLE GMBH & CO., MASCHINENFABRIK Nikolaus-Thoman-Strasse 5-7 D-89264 Weissenhorn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willbold, Johann, Dipl.-Ing. Memminger Strasse 24 D-7912 Weissenhorn / DE | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Munk, Ludwig Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Munk, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Prinzregentenstrasse 1 D-86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106838.7 | 10.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | DE19893912076 | 13.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3912076 | [1990/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392453 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392453 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392453 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B04C1/00, B07B7/086, B07B9/02, B01D45/12 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
B04C1/00 (EP);
B07B4/02 (EP);
B07B7/01 (EP);
B07B7/086 (EP);
B07B9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI [1990/42] | Title | German: | Fliehkraftabscheider | [1990/42] | English: | Centrifugal separator | [1990/42] | French: | Séparateur centrifuge | [1990/42] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH201235 (NEUKOM EDWIN [CH]); | [A]DE958170 (BABCOCK & WILCOX DAMPFKESSEL); | [A]US2915179 (LYKKEN HENRY G); | [A]DE1078859 (SVENSKA FLAEKTFABRIKEN AB); | [A]US3015393 (ROZSA TIBOR A, et al); | [A]GB1080911 (IMP TOBACCO CO LTD); | [A]WO8504823 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]) |