EP0394753 - Coding device for electrical assemblies pluggable on a back panel wiring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zell, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Moritz-von-Schwind-Weg 80 D-8130 Niederpöcking / DE | 02 /
Pelzl, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Alpenblickstrasse 5 D-8150 Holzkirchen / DE | [1994/52] |
Former [1990/44] | 01 /
Zell, Karl Moritz von Schwind Weg 80 D-8130 Niederpöcking / DE | ||
02 /
Pelzl, Leo Alpenblickstrasse 5 D-8150 Holzkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106912.0 | 11.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | DE19890005362U | 27.04.1989 Original published format: DE 8905362 U | [1990/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0394753 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0394753 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394753 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/645 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
H01R13/642 (EP);
H05K7/1455 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/44] | Title | German: | Codiervorrichtung für auf eine Rückwandverdrahtung aufsteckbare elektrische Baugruppen | [1990/44] | English: | Coding device for electrical assemblies pluggable on a back panel wiring | [1990/44] | French: | Dispositif de codage pour assemblages électriques enfichables sur un câblage de panneau arrière | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 12.04.1995 | [1997/17] |
Former [1997/16] | SE | 12.04.1995 | |
Former [1996/04] | SE | 12.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2743033 (CRYPTO AG STEINHAUSEN); | [Y]US4167032 (SCAGNELLI HENRY J [US]); | [YD]DE8428477U ; | [A]EP0195955 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |