EP0392499 - Apparatus for generating high-quality character pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/42] | Method and apparatus for generating high-quality character pattern | ||
[1995/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/42] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Fumitaka, c/o Intellectual Property Division K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106939.3 | 11.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | JP19890092493 | 12.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9249389 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392499 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392499 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392499 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/00 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
G09G5/24 (EP,US);
G06V10/46 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/25] |
Former [1990/42] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Zeichenmusters hoher Qualität | [1995/25] | English: | Apparatus for generating high-quality character pattern | [1995/25] | French: | Dispositif de génération d'un motif de caractères de haute qualité | [1995/25] |
Former [1990/42] | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Zeichenmusters hoher Qualität | ||
Former [1990/42] | Method and apparatus for generating high-quality character pattern | ||
Former [1990/42] | Méthode et dispositif de génération d'un motif de caractères de haute qualité | Examination procedure | 08.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/42] | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0200885 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]); | [AP]EP0327002 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS vol. C-34, no. 7, 1 July 1985, NEW YORK, USA pages 666 - 673; M. CHLAMTAC ET AL: 'THE SHIFT X PARITY WATCH ALGORITHM FOR RASTER SCAN DISPLAYS' |