EP0393566 - Circuit breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.E.C. UNELEC 1572 Route de Guise, Harly F-02100 Saint-Quentin / FR | [1990/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hennemann, Jean 55, rue Alexandre Ribot F-02100 Saint-Quentin / FR | 02 /
Desjardin, Daniel 29, rue Pierre Semard F-02430 Gauchy / FR | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107229.8 | 17.04.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | FR19890005124 | 18.04.1989 Original published format: FR 8905124 | [1990/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0393566 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393566 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/52 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
H01H71/526 (EP);
H01H2300/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/43] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schutzschalter | [1990/43] | English: | Circuit breaker | [1990/43] | French: | Disjoncteur électrique | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0008558 ; | [A]EP0295158 ; | [A]EP0143682 ; | [A]EP0046841 |