EP0445344 - Slicer apparatus for woodwork [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARUNAKA TEKKOSHO INC. 1-5-5 Kitamariko, Shizuoka City Shizuoka Prefecture, 421-01 / JP | [1991/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mochizuki, Toshihei 1-5-5 Kitamariko, Shizuoka City Shizuoka Pref, 421-01 / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Shigeru 1-5-5 Kitamariko, Shizuoka City Shizuoka Pref, 421-01 / JP | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Marx, Lothar, et al Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Marx, Lothar, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107860.0 | 25.04.1990 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | JP19900054285 | 06.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5428590 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445344 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445344 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B27L5/06, B27M1/00, B27L5/00 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
B27L5/002 (EP,US);
B27L5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/37] | Title | German: | Holzschneidemaschine | [1991/37] | English: | Slicer apparatus for woodwork | [1991/37] | French: | Tronçonneuse à bois | [1991/37] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3783917 (MOCHIZUKI N); | [Y]CA1227961 (LISKA FRANK F, et al); | [A]DE4876 ; | [A]DE238774 ; | [A]US1350879 (ANDRO NYLUND); | [A]US2760533 (BASS DONALD E); | [A]DE2905786 (MEINAN MACHINERY WORKS); | [A]EP0322646 (MARTIN MICHEL); | [A]FR1317143 |