EP0396065 - Novel amino acid derivatives possessing renin-inhibitory activities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1 Toranomon, 2-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105 / JP | For all designated states Yoshitomi Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1 Toranomon, 2-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105 / JP | ||
For all designated states YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchida, Itsuo, c/o Pharmaceutical Research Laboratories, Japan Tobacco Inc., 6-2, Umegaoka Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227 / JP | 02 /
Shibata, Saizo, c/o Pharmaceutical Research Laboratories, Japan Tobacco Inc., 6-2, Umegaoka Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227 / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Yasuki, c/o Pharmaceutical Research Laboratories, Japan Tobacco Inc., 6-2, Umegaoka Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227 / JP | 04 /
Ikemoto, Yukinari, c/o Pharmaceutical Research Laboratories, Japan Tobacco Inc., 6-2, Umegaoka Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227 / JP | 05 /
Iwata, Kunio, c/o Texicology Research Lab. Japan Tobacco Inc., 23 Nakogi Hatano-shi, Kanagawa 257 / JP | 06 /
Ikegami, Kiyoteru 942-47, Ogawa-cho 1-chome Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187 / JP | 07 /
Nakamura, Ikuro 1-803, 1-4, Moto-cho Kiyose-shi, Tokyo 204 / JP | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1990/45] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108163.8 | 28.04.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | JP19890112245 | 02.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11224589 | JP19890278490 | 27.10.1989 Original published format: JP 27849089 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0396065 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, C07K5/02, C07K5/08, C07D233/64, A61K37/64, A61K31/415 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP);
C07K5/06 (KR);
C07K5/0202 (EP);
C07K5/06078 (EP);
C07K5/0808 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/45] | Title | German: | Aminosäure-Derivate mit reninhemmender Aktivität | [1990/45] | English: | Novel amino acid derivatives possessing renin-inhibitory activities | [1990/45] | French: | Dérivés d'acide aminé comme inhibiteurs de la rénine | [1990/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 02.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.10.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0202577 (SEARLE & CO [US]); | [A]WO8805050 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al); | [A]EP0296581 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) | [Y] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 146, no. 3, 1987, pages 959-963, Academic Press, Inc.; G.J. HANSON et al.: "Enhanced potency dipeptide glycol renin inhibitors: Studies in vitro and in the conscious rhesus" |