EP0403772 - Device for obtaining a load signal from a mechanically sprung and driven axle of running gear comprising a lift-axle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO Vermögensverwaltungs-GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 30432 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states WABCO Vermögensverwaltungs-GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckert, Horst Marienhöhe 2 D-3056 Rehburg-Loccum 3 / DE | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [1993/17] | Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1990/52] | Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108233.9 | 30.04.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | DE19893920287 | 21.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3920287 | [1990/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403772 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403772 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403772 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B62D61/12 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
B60T8/171 (EP);
B60T8/1837 (EP);
B62D61/125 (EP);
B60G2400/252 (EP);
B60G2401/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/52] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Gewinnung eines Achslastsignals der mechanisch gefederten Antriebsachse eines Lift-Achsaggregats | [1990/52] | English: | Device for obtaining a load signal from a mechanically sprung and driven axle of running gear comprising a lift-axle | [1990/52] | French: | Dispositif d'obtention d'un signal de charge d'un essieu d'un arbre de commande suspendu mécaniquement ayant un essieu relevable | [1990/52] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1946446 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA) | Examination | DE2652811 |