EP0399252 - Smoking article with improved insulating material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 401 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 401 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banerjee, Chandra Kumar 4430 Chebar Drive Pfafftown, North Carolina 27040 / US | 02 /
Lehman, Richard Long 107 Ridgeview Drive Belle Mead, New Jersey 08502 / US | 03 /
Squires, William Campbell 600 Barnsdale Road Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27106 / US | 04 /
Hayden, Rhonda Fae 404 Hollinswood Avenue Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27103 / US | 05 /
Raynor, Debra Louise 2802 Dextor Avenue Greensboro, North Carolina 27407 / US | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108289.1 | 01.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | US19890354605 | 22.05.1989 Original published format: US 354605 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399252 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399252 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/16, A24F47/00 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
A24B15/165 (EP,US);
A24D1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Rauchartikel mit Dämmstoff | [1990/48] | English: | Smoking article with improved insulating material | [1990/48] | French: | Article à fumer avec matériau isolant | [1990/48] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.06.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 19.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 23.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 15.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61258099 ; | [A]DE2752367 (BAYER AG); | [A]US4346028 (GRIFFITH EDWARD J); | [X]US4383890 (OSHIMA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0212234 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) | [Y] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, AN=86-343459 [52], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-61 258 099 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILL) 15-11-1986, & JP61258099 A 00000000 |