EP0396115 - Method of forming agglutinates in blood samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kessler, Marsha A. 2903 North Seminary, 204 Chicago, Illinois 60657 / US | 02 /
Prewitt, Patricia L. 28566 West Big Hollow Ingleside, Illinois 60041 / US | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90108316.2 | 02.05.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | US19890346674 | 03.05.1989 Original published format: US 346674 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0396115 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0396115 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/80 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
G01N33/80 (EP,US);
G01N33/50 (KR);
G01N33/5304 (EP,US);
Y10S435/967 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bildung von Agglutinaten in Blutproben | [1990/45] | English: | Method of forming agglutinates in blood samples | [1990/45] | French: | Procédé de formation des agglutinats dans les échantillons de sang | [1990/45] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/07] | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3457344 (MATUHASI TYOKU, et al); | [A]US4447396 (KANO TOKIO [JP]); | [A]US3492096 (HATTERSLEY PAUL G); | [A]GB1270416 (UNGER HANS PETER OLOF [SE]); | [AP]EP0352139 (LIM PAK LEONG) |