EP0419760 - Zero standby power, radiation hardened, memory redundancy circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciraula, Michael Kevin 8515 Stonewall Road Manassas, Virginia 22110 / US | 02 /
Durham, Christopher McCall 10835 Gambrill Drive Manassas, Virginia 22110 / US | 03 /
Jallice, Derwin L. 1500 Farsta Court Reston, Virginia 22090 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/14] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108357.6 | 03.05.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | US19890414889 | 28.09.1989 Original published format: US 414889 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419760 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419760 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419760 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
G11C29/785 (EP,US);
G11C17/16 (EP,US);
G11C29/83 (EP,US);
G11C5/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/14] | Title | German: | Null-Ruheleistung aufweisende, strahlungsfeste Speicherredundanzschaltung | [1996/34] | English: | Zero standby power, radiation hardened, memory redundancy circuit | [1991/14] | French: | Circuit de redondance de mémoire à consommation au repos nulle et résistant aux effets de rayonnement | [1991/14] |
Former [1991/14] | Nullruheleistungsaufnahme, strahlungsgeschützte Speicherredundanzschaltung | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0195412 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0148722 (MOSTEK CORP [US]); | [A]EP0151849 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US4733372 (NANBU HIROAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4714839 (CHUNG SHINE C [US]) |