EP0397043 - Apparatus for generating cold and heat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schulte, Franz-Josef Heisterstrasse 23 D-59939 Olsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states Schulte, Franz-Josef, Dipl.-Ing Heisterstrasse 23 D-59939 Olsberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Dörner, Lothar Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | Dörner, Lothar, Dipl.-Ing. Stresemannstrasse 15 D-58095 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108431.9 | 04.05.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | DE19890005769U | 09.05.1989 Original published format: DE 8905769 U | [1990/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397043 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397043 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/36, A61F7/00, F25B21/04 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
A61F7/007 (EP);
A61B18/02 (EP);
F25B21/02 (EP);
A61F2007/0087 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/46] | A61B17/36, A61F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/46] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Erzeugung von Kälte und Wärme | [1990/46] | English: | Apparatus for generating cold and heat | [1990/46] | French: | Dispositif pour la génération du froid et de la chaleur | [1990/46] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 22.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.02.1994 | GB | 23.02.1994 | NL | 23.02.1994 | SE | 23.02.1994 | AT | 04.05.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [1995/40] | GB | 23.02.1994 | |
NL | 23.02.1994 | ||
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
AT | 04.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | GB | 23.02.1994 | |
NL | 23.02.1994 | ||
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | GB | 23.02.1994 | |
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 23.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4090517 (TAKENAKA NAGATOKI); | [X]WO8103608 (MAJOR E); | [A]DE3327082 (ELECTROLUX SARL [LU]); | [A]EP0239048 (POLITECHNIKA WARSZAWSKA [PL]) |