EP0400356 - Sulfonamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Klaus, Dr. Gabelsbergerstrasse 7 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 02 /
Mayer, Horst, Dr. Faselwiese 19 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Ditrich, Klaus, Dr. Paray-le-Monial-Strasse 12 D-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | 04 /
Hamprecht, Gerhard, Dr. Rote-Turm-Strasse 28 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 05 /
Wuerzer, Bruno, Dr. Ruedigerstrasse 13 D-6701 Otterstadt / DE | 06 /
Westphalen, Karl-Otto, Dr. Mausbergweg 58 D-6720 Speyer / DE | [1990/49] | Application number, filing date | 90108547.2 | 07.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | DE19893916469 | 20.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3916469 | [1990/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0400356 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400356 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D473/00, A01N43/90, // (C07D471/04, 235:00, 221:00) | [1990/49] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D473/00 (KR);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
C07D473/06 (EP,US);
C07D473/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/49] | Title | German: | Sulfonamide | [1990/49] | English: | Sulfonamides | [1990/49] | French: | Sulfonamides | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 18.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.08.1994 | DK | 10.08.1994 | ES | 10.08.1994 | IT | 10.08.1994 | NL | 10.08.1994 | AT | 07.05.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 10.08.1994 | |
DK | 10.08.1994 | ||
ES | 10.08.1994 | ||
IT | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
AT | 07.05.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 10.08.1994 | |
DK | 10.08.1994 | ||
IT | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
AT | 07.05.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 10.08.1994 | |
DK | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
AT | 07.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | BE | 10.08.1994 | |
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
AT | 07.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/26] | BE | 10.08.1994 | |
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | NL | 10.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0150974 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [Y]EP0244269 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0272628 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0329012 (BASF AG [DE]) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 9, 1966, pp. 373-378; A.G. BEAMAN et al.: 'Purine sulfonamides' | [AD] - SYNTHESIS, Nov. 1982, Seiten 984-986; F.L.MERCHAN et al.: 'Synthesis of 2-sulfonylaminobenzimidazoles and 4,5-dicyano-2-sulfonylaminoimidazoles om N-dichloromethylenesulfonamides' | [AD] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY Band 42, No. 18, 1977, pp. 3065-3070; M.M. WEGNER et al.: 'Perhydrogenation of 2,8-Diaminopurine' |