EP0399274 - Flat plastic-coated material in sheet form or fitted form using a carrier with latex foam coating and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1994 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitex GmbH Fuhrberger Weg 10 D-30900 Wedemark / DE | [1990/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Uwe, Dipl.-Kfm. Lührshof 10 D-3006 Burgwedel 1 / DE | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Rücker, Wolfgang Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Rücker, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108549.8 | 07.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | DE19893917219 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3917219 | [1990/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399274 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399274 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D06N3/00, A41D13/10, A43B17/14 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
A41D13/088 (EP);
D06N3/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Kunststoffbeschichtetes, flächiges Material in bahnförmiger oder abgepasster Form unter Verwendung eines Trägers mit einer Latexschaumschicht sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Materials | [1990/48] | English: | Flat plastic-coated material in sheet form or fitted form using a carrier with latex foam coating and method for its production | [1990/48] | French: | Matière plate enduite de plastique en forme de bande ou forme particulière utilisant un support avec une enduction mousse en latex et son procédé de production | [1990/48] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/36] | 13.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.1992 | 31.05.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3306425 ; | [AP]DE3927533 |