EP0397149 - Musical tone waveform signal generating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunimoto, Toshifumi, c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho, Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108747.8 | 09.05.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | JP19890115546 | 09.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11554689 | [1990/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0397149 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0397149 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397149 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00, G10H1/16 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
G10H5/007 (EP,US);
G10H2250/461 (EP,US);
G10H2250/515 (EP,US);
G10H2250/535 (EP,US);
Y10S84/09 (EP,US);
Y10S84/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/46] | G10H1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1990/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Musiktonwellenformsignalen | [1990/46] | English: | Musical tone waveform signal generating apparatus | [1990/46] | French: | Dispositif générateur d'un signal de forme d'onde musicale | [1990/46] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4475229 (FRESE STEFAN [AT]); | [A]US4548119 (WACHI MASATADA [JP], et al); | [XD]EP0248527 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [A]US4736663 (WAWRZYNEK JOHN C [US], et al) |