EP0397153 - Chiral smectic liquid crystal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanyu, Yukio, c/o CANON K. K. 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Asaoka, Masanobu, c/o CANON K. K. 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/46] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90108755.1 | 09.05.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | JP19890119605 | 11.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11960589 | JP19890119606 | 11.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11960689 | JP19890119607 | 11.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11960789 | JP19890119608 | 11.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11960889 | JP19890119609 | 11.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11960989 | JP19890119610 | 11.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11961089 | JP19890119611 | 11.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11961189 | JP19890119612 | 11.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11961289 | JP19900100769 | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10076990 | [1990/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0397153 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0397153 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397153 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337, C08G73/10 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
C08G73/1071 (EP);
G02F1/133 (KR);
C08G73/1039 (EP);
C08G73/1067 (EP);
G02F1/133723 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/46] | Title | German: | Chiralsmektische Flüssigkristallvorrichtung | [1990/46] | English: | Chiral smectic liquid crystal device | [1990/46] | French: | Dispositif à base de cristaux liquides chiraux smectiques | [1990/46] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.1995 | BE | 02.08.1995 | CH | 02.08.1995 | DK | 02.08.1995 | GR | 02.08.1995 | LI | 02.08.1995 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
CH | 02.08.1995 | ||
DK | 02.08.1995 | ||
LI | 02.08.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
CH | 02.08.1995 | ||
LI | 02.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 02.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2174399 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]); | [A]EP0231781 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |