EP0398308 - A vehicle suspension system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Mineharu 6-29, Minami-Sakae 3-chome Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Takehara, Shin Ha-402, 1088-1, Nakashima, Takaya-cho Higashi-Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Morita, Toshiki Nu-308, 1088-1, Nakashima, Takaya-cho Higashi-Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/47] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109277.5 | 16.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | JP19890124066 | 17.05.1989 Original published format: JP 12406689 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0398308 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0398308 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/01 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
B60G17/0162 (EP,US);
B60G2202/154 (EP,US);
B60G2400/102 (EP,US);
B60G2400/204 (EP,US);
B60G2400/252 (EP,US);
B60G2400/41 (EP,US);
B60G2400/5122 (EP,US);
B60G2600/02 (EP,US);
B60G2800/012 (EP,US);
B60G2800/014 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/47] | Title | German: | Aufhängungssystem eines Fahrzeugs | [1990/47] | English: | A vehicle suspension system | [1990/47] | French: | Un système de suspension d'un véhicule | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 08.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP195927 ; | [A]EP0306004 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0236947 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0358231 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP0264944 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [AD]EP0114757 (LOTUS CAR [GB]) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 305 (M-849)(3653) 13 July 1989, & JP-A-1 95927 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) 14 April 1989,, & JP195927 A 19890414 |