EP0398358 - Aluminum electroplating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Shoichiro, c/o Tsukuba Research Center Mitsubishi Petro. Co. Ltd., 8-3-1, Chuo, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Ida, Kazuhiko, c/o Tsukuba Research Center Mitsubishi Petro. Co. Ltd., 8-3-1, Chuo, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Hitoshi, c/o Tsukuba Research Center Mitsubishi Petro. Co. Ltd., 8-3-1, Chuo, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Setsuko, c/o New Materials Research Lab Nisshin Steel Co., Ltd., 7-1, Kohya Shinmachi Ichikawa-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Saeki, Isao, c/o New Materials Research Lab. Nisshin Steel Co., Ltd., 7-1, Kohya Shinmachi Ichikawa-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109469.8 | 18.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | JP19890122740 | 18.05.1989 Original published format: JP 12274089 | JP19890122741 | 18.05.1989 Original published format: JP 12274189 | JP19890158289 | 22.06.1989 Original published format: JP 15828989 | JP19890193862 | 28.07.1989 Original published format: JP 19386289 | JP19890269032 | 18.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26903289 | JP19890269033 | 18.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26903389 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0398358 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0398358 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0398358 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/44, C25D3/66 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
C25D3/665 (EP,US);
C25D3/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1990/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Elektroplattierung von Aluminium | [1990/47] | English: | Aluminum electroplating method | [1990/47] | French: | Procédé de dépôt électrolytique de l'aluminium | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 26.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.03.1994 | NL | 09.03.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 09.03.1994 | |
NL | 09.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | NL | 09.03.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0274774 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]EP0323520 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4747916 (KATO YOSHIO [JP], et al) | [A] - J. ELECTROANAL. CHEM., vol. 248, 1988, pages 431-440, Elsevier Sequoia S.A., Lausanne, CH; P.K. LAI et al.: "Electrodeposition of aluminium in aluminium chloride/1-methyl-3-ethylimidazolium chloride" |