EP0399499 - Integrated-type squid magnetometer and system for biomagnetic measurements using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokosawa, Koichi, Hitachi Daiyon Kyoshinryo 14-6, Nishikoigakubo-4-chome Kokubunji-shi / JP | 02 /
Nakane, Hideaki 617-152, Yokokawamachi Hachioji-shi / JP | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109809.5 | 23.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | JP19890132413 | 25.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13241389 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399499 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399499 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399499 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/035 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
G01R33/0358 (EP,US);
Y10S505/846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1990/48] | Title | German: | Squid-Magnetometer integrierter Art und Anordnung zu dessen Anwendung für biomagnetische Messungen | [1990/48] | English: | Integrated-type squid magnetometer and system for biomagnetic measurements using the same | [1990/48] | French: | Magnétomètre à squid du type intégré et dispositif de mesure biomagnétique utilisant celui-ci | [1990/48] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0111826 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0184670 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0327123 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [AD]US4761611 (HOENIG ECKHARDT [DE]) | [Y] - CRYOGENICS, vol. 23, no. 5, May 1983, pages 263-264, Guildford, GB; S.I. BONDARENKO et al.: "A planar thin-film SQUID of high inductive coupling constant" |