EP0399559 - Process for assembling a spring plate-shock absorber rod subassembly forming part of an automotive shock absorber-spring assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gandiglio, Romolo Via Torino 33 I-14019 Villanova d'Asti / IT | 02 /
Rabino, Edoardo Corso Benedetto Croce 36 I-10135 Torino / IT | 03 /
Ravizza, Renato Strada Miravalle 19/10 I-10024 Moncalieri / IT | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Boggio, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 90109996.0 | 25.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | IT19890067405 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: IT 6740589 | [1990/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399559 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399559 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399559 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60G15/06, F16F9/32 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
F16F9/3221 (EP);
B60G15/062 (EP);
B60G2206/8201 (EP);
B60G2206/82013 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/48] | F16F9/32, B60G15/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zusammensetzen einer Baugruppe, bestehend aus Federteller und Stossdämpferstange in einem Kraftfahrzeugfederbein | [1990/48] | English: | Process for assembling a spring plate-shock absorber rod subassembly forming part of an automotive shock absorber-spring assembly | [1990/48] | French: | Méthode pour l'assemblage d'un ensemble à coupelle de ressort et tige d'amortisseur formant partie d'une unité de suspension à ressort et amortisseur pour véhicule | [1990/48] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/29] | 19.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1973261U (NSU MOTORENWERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0108041 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]); | [AP]EP0332915 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) |