EP0401659 - Fixing of a mud flap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONA GmbH -Industrieerzeugnisse von hohem Rang- Hauptstrasse 57 D-77694 Kehl / DE | [1990/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arenhold, Knut Westend 7 D-2000 Hamburg 52 / DE | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90110246.7 | 30.05.1990 | [1990/50] | Priority number, date | DE19893918802 | 06.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3918802 | [1990/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0401659 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0401659 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/18 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
B62D25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/50] | Title | German: | Schmutzfängerbefestigung | [1990/50] | English: | Fixing of a mud flap | [1990/50] | French: | Fixation d'une bavette de garde-boue | [1990/50] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.07.1993 | DK | 21.07.1993 | ES | 21.07.1993 | IT | 21.07.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 21.07.1993 | |
DK | 21.07.1993 | ||
ES | 21.07.1993 | ||
IT | 21.07.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 21.07.1993 | |
DK | 21.07.1993 | ||
IT | 21.07.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 21.07.1993 | |
DK | 21.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | BE | 21.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2905753 ; | [A]DE2352472 ; | [AD]DE2851748 (ARENHOLD K); | [AD]DE2342365 |