EP0403843 - Spindle driving device for a machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okachi, Hiroaki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Nagoya Works, 1-14 Yadaminami 5-chome, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Hayashida, Takahiro, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Nagoya Works, 1-14 Yadaminami 5-chome, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Unno, Mahito, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Nagoya Works, 1-14 Yadaminami 5-chome, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90110270.7 | 30.05.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | JP19890152971 | 15.06.1989 Original published format: JP 15297189 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403843 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403843 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403843 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q39/04, G05B19/18, B23Q15/00 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
B23Q39/048 (EP,US);
B23Q5/04 (KR);
G05B19/182 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50235 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2502 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2524 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/28] | B23Q15/00, B23B9/00 | ||
Former IPC [1990/52] | B23Q1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/03] |
Former [1990/52] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Spindel-Antriebsvorrichtung für eine Werkzeugmaschine | [1990/52] | English: | Spindle driving device for a machine tool | [1990/52] | French: | Dispositif de commande de broche pour une machine-outil | [1990/52] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0098309 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0290693 (HOFER IND INC [CA]); | [A]EP0242870 (LITTON AUTOMATION SYSTEMS [US]); | [A]GB2061554 (GFM FERTIGUNGSTECHNIK); | [A]EP0303300 (AE PLC [GB]); | [A]GB2092333 (CONE BLANCHARD MACHINE CO) |