EP0400650 - Linearized differential amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanimoto, Hiroshi 407 Shinkawasaki-Grand-Height, 1781-3 Huruichiba Saiwai-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90110372.1 | 31.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | JP19890135809 | 31.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13580989 | JP19890234615 | 12.09.1989 Original published format: JP 23461589 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400650 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400650 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400650 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45, H03F1/32 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
H03F1/3211 (EP,US);
H03F3/45071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/49] | Title | German: | Linearisierter Differenzverstärker | [1990/49] | English: | Linearized differential amplifier | [1990/49] | French: | Amplificateur différentiel linéarisé | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 02.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62171307 ; | [X]DE3027071 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 13 (E-573)(2860) 14 January 1988, & JP-A-62 171307 (IWATSU ELECTRIC CO LTD) 28 July 1987,, & JP62171307 A 19870728 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS. vol. cas31, no. 10, October 1984, NEW YORK US pages 891 - 894; A. NEDUNGADI et al: "Design of linear CMOS Transconductance Elements " | Examination | EP0312017 |